E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3759
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4947
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1298
|
Journal Page: 4946
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4946
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5384
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3513
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3323
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1716
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2917
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2917
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1634
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1461
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#552
|
Journal Page: 2476
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2476
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Amended
|
2-Price, Anchia, and P. King
|
Journal Page: 2476
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2472
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amendment as amended fails of adoption
|
16-Mrquez
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
17-Mrquez
|
Journal Page: 2430
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
16-Mrquez
|
Journal Page: 2427
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
14-P. King, et al.
|
Journal Page: 2426
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
13-P. King and Anchia
|
Journal Page: 2425
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amended
|
11-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 2424
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
7-Rose
|
Journal Page: 2420
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
3-Allen
|
Journal Page: 2418
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2414
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2289
|
Journal Page: 2414
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
04/03/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 676
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 675
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 675
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 670
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 670
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 668
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 668
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 609
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 413
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 413
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|