E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3864
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3762
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4971
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1302
|
Journal Page: 4970
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4970
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3532
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3532
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2401
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2254
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2253
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2253
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2253
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2200
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3391
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#850
|
Journal Page: 3391
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3391
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amended
|
9-Branch
|
Journal Page: 3385
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
5-Raney
|
Journal Page: 3379
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
2-Aycock, et al.
|
Journal Page: 3377
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
3-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 3377
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Aycock, Callegari, Harless, Otto, Kleinschmidt, Walle, Kolkhorst, Cook, Simpson, Lavender, Springe
|
Journal Page: 3376
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3376
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#844
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Amended
|
31-Krause
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Motion to table fails
|
31-Krause
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3345
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
31-Krause
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
29-Darby
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
30-Branch
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
28-Zedler
|
Journal Page: 3341
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
|
Journal Page: 3341
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3327
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
21-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 3326
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
13-Ratliff
|
Journal Page: 3315
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
6-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1557
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1557
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1542
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 859
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 859
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 859
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA12 West
|
Journal Page: 857
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 856
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA5 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 854
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 854
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA6 West
|
Journal Page: 854
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 413
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 413
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|