E | 06/14/2013 | See remarks for effective date | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/26/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3834 | |
House | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5381 | |
Senate | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3515 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3068 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2807 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4171 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | RV#1058 | Journal Page: 4171 |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 4171 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4171 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3998 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3998 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3910 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Referred to Pensions | Journal Page: 3362 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3362 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3242 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1870 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1798 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1798 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1798 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1798 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1798 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1798 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1797 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Birdwell | Journal Page: 1783 |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1783 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1783 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1727 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1703 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 413 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 413 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |