E
|
06/14/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3870
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3485
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3485
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3485
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3483
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3931
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1009
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3930
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3846
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1200
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1200
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 487
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 408
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 122
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 122
|
Senate
|
01/22/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|