E | 05/10/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/10/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1765 | |
E | 05/01/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1371 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2157 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1329 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1371 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1271 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1857 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1856 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | RV#303 | Journal Page: 1857 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1857 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1857 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1839 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1839 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 608 | Journal Page: 1839 |
House | 04/23/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1775 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 1200 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1200 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 747 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 519 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 170 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 122 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 122 | |
Senate | 01/22/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/22/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |