Senate | 05/20/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1115 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 976 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |