Senate | 05/20/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 123 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 123 | |
Senate | 01/23/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |