E
|
05/29/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3834
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2403
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1005
|
Journal Page: 3926
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3926
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3926
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3090
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
03/13/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 487
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Carona
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 406
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 443
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 322
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 243
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 123
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 123
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|