Senate | 05/21/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 798 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 291 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 123 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 123 | |
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |