Senate | 04/29/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1310 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1115 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 606 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |