E
|
05/18/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
E
|
05/09/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3016
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2841
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1666
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1665
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#437
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 385
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2075
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1453
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1453
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 747
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 466
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 125
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 125
|
Senate
|
01/25/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|