E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/25/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3737 | |
House | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4914 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3280 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2910 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2047 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3596 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Record vote | RV#924 | Journal Page: 3598 |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3598 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3598 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3573 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3573 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 1200 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1200 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 748 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 519 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 466 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 338 | |
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 161 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 161 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |