Senate | 03/05/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 334 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 308 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 291 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 243 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 89 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 89 | |
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |