E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5385
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3754
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3754
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1063
|
Journal Page: 3754
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3523
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4907
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1284
|
Journal Page: 4906
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4906
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 2795
|
Journal Page: 4905
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3369
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2849
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2849
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4220
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4220
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4075
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4075
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4075
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2484
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2483
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#937
|
Journal Page: 3696
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3696
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3696
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3680
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3680
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3521
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1200
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1200
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1103
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 660
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 568
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 218
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 162
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 162
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|