E | 05/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1810 | |
E | 05/02/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1408 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2274 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1339 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2050 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Record vote | RV#394 | Journal Page: 2050 |
House | 04/30/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2050 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2050 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1994 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1994 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1994 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1489 | Journal Page: 1994 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Referred to Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 748 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 519 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 467 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 467 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 467 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 467 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 467 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 467 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 467 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 218 | |
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 164 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 164 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |