E | 05/18/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
E | 05/07/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2719 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1513 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1461 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Record vote | RV#572 | Journal Page: 2494 |
House | 05/06/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2494 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2494 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2450 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2450 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1304 | Journal Page: 2450 |
House | 05/03/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 1493 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1493 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1425 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 719 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 719 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 719 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 719 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 719 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 719 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 216 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 164 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 164 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |