E
|
05/18/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
E
|
05/08/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2720
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1534
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1534
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1534
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1139
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#257
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Sheets
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1711
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 362
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1471
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 780
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 739
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 739
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 739
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 739
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 739
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 739
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 739
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 608
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 243
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 164
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 164
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|