E | 05/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1810 | |
E | 05/02/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1408 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2274 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1339 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Record vote | RV#392 | Journal Page: 2049 |
House | 04/30/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2048 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1989 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1989 | |
House | 04/29/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1549 | Journal Page: 1989 |
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2076 | |
House | 04/26/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1653 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 978 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 165 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 165 | |
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |