Senate | 02/26/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 309 | |
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 194 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 178 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 165 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 165 | |
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |