House | 05/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3909 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 2544 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2544 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1827 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1203 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1160 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1160 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1160 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1159 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1146 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1146 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 165 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 165 | |
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |