E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Filed without the Governor's signature | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/16/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1908 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3362 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1863 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1870 | |
Senate | 05/14/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1800 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3215 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3215 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Record vote | RV#818 | Journal Page: 3214 |
House | 05/14/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3214 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3214 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3103 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3103 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Amendment tabled | 1-Laubenberg | Journal Page: 3102 |
House | 05/13/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3102 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2844 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1651 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 954 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 954 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 954 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 954 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 954 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 954 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 953 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 752 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 166 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 166 | |
Senate | 02/01/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |