E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/25/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3737 | |
House | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4914 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3280 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2910 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2165 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Record vote | RV#978 | Journal Page: 3777 |
House | 05/20/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3777 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3777 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3643 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3643 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3242 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 2155 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2155 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1651 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 957 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 957 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 957 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 957 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 90 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 90 | |
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |