E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/28/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5434 | |
Senate | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3852 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/24/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 4874 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3200 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 3200 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 3200 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3199 | |
Senate | 05/21/2013 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2403 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Record vote | RV#1012 | Journal Page: 3932 |
House | 05/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3932 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3932 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 3850 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Amended | 1-Toth and Parker | Journal Page: 3849 |
House | 05/20/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3849 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3090 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1184 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 561 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 168 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 168 | |
Senate | 02/04/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |