Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB345 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 345


 AN ACT
 relating to certain programs for inmates, including the abolition
 of the state boot camp program and the use of programs by volunteer
 and faith-based organizations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 501.009, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 501.009.  VOLUNTEER AND FAITH-BASED ORGANIZATIONS;
 REPORT. (a)  The department shall adopt a policy that requires
 each warden to identify [actively encourage] volunteer and
 faith-based organizations that [to] provide [the following]
 programs for inmates housed in facilities operated by the
 department. The policy must require each warden to actively
 encourage volunteer and faith-based organizations to provide the
 following programs for inmates in the warden's facility:
 (1)  literacy and education programs;
 (2)  life skills programs;
 (3)  job skills programs;
 (4)  parent-training programs;
 (5)  drug and alcohol rehabilitation programs;
 (6)  support group programs;
 (7)  arts and crafts programs; and
 (8)  other programs determined by the department to aid
 inmates in the transition between confinement and society and to
 reduce incidence of recidivism among inmates.
 (b)  The policy must require that each warden submit a report
 to the board not later than December 31 of each year that includes,
 for the preceding fiscal year, a summary of:
 (1)  the programs provided to inmates under this
 section; and
 (2)  the actions taken by the warden to identify
 volunteer and faith-based organizations willing to provide
 programs to inmates and to encourage those organizations to provide
 programs in the warden's facility.
 SECTION 2.  The following are repealed:
 (1)  Section 8, Article 42.12, Code of Criminal
 Procedure; and
 (2)  Section 499.052, Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  On and after the effective date of this Act:
 (1)  a judge may not recommend a person for placement in
 the state boot camp program under Section 499.052, Government Code;
 and
 (2)  a participant in the state boot camp program
 remains a participant in the program only until the later of the
 following dates:
 (A)  the date on which the convicting court
 suspends further execution of the sentence and reassumes custody of
 the person; or
 (B)  the date on which the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice transfers the person to another unit in the
 department.
 (b)  Section 8, Article 42.12, Code of Criminal Procedure,
 and Section 499.052, Government Code, repealed by this Act, are
 continued in effect for the limited purpose of the orderly
 abolition of the state boot camp program created by those
 provisions.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than December 1, 2013, the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice shall adopt the policy, including a
 schedule for implementing the policy, required by Section 501.009,
 Government Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 345 passed the Senate on
 March 27, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 24, 2013, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 345 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 21, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 2, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor