E
|
05/25/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3738
|
E
|
05/14/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1810
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3240
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1870
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#822
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3116
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#811
|
Journal Page: 3115
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3115
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
5-Keffer
|
Journal Page: 3114
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
4-Perry
|
Journal Page: 3113
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Article III, Section 30
|
Journal Page: 3109
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3109
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/13/13 3:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 3102
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Article III, Section 30
|
Journal Page: 3101
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3101
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution recalling from House
|
SCR 33
|
Journal Page: 963
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1627
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 923
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 923
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 923
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 923
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 923
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 923
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 923
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 923
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 882
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 168
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 168
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|