E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3864
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 40
|
Journal Page: 5409
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 40
|
Journal Page: 3757
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4874
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3214
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3214
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3214
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3208
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1066
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Article III, Section 35
|
Journal Page: 4180
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4178
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4178
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1051
|
Journal Page: 4026
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4026
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 4026
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment tabled
|
4-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 4025
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Amended
|
2-Darby
|
Journal Page: 4019
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Sections 2 and 3
|
Journal Page: 4018
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Darby
|
Journal Page: 4017
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4017
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 609
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 397
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 168
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 168
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|