E
|
05/25/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
E
|
05/14/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1810
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3240
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#761
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3040
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3034
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2365
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 748
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 468
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 468
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 468
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 468
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 468
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 468
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 468
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 185
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 185
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|