E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5024
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1316
|
Journal Page: 5024
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5024
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5385
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3755
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3589
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4499
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4499
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2700
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2700
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2700
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2700
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2700
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3553
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#904
|
Journal Page: 3552
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3552
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Toth
|
Journal Page: 3552
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3552
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3422
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3422
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-J. Sheffield
|
Journal Page: 3422
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3422
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 185
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 185
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|