E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3691
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2025
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2036
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3520
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1877
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1877
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1877
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1877
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3086
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#801
|
Journal Page: 3085
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3085
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3085
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amended
|
1-M. Gonzlez
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2004
|
Journal Page: 2911
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3090
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1408
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1359
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1359
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1359
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1310
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 195
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 187
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 187
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|