Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB377 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio, Rodriguez S.B. No. 377
 (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2013; February 11, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 25, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 25, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 377 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the determination of certain exemptions from the
 administration of state assessment instruments to public school
 students and to the consideration of the performance of certain
 students on state assessment instruments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.027, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a-2)  Unless a student is enrolled in a school in the United
 States for a period of at least 60 consecutive days during a year,
 the student may not be considered to be enrolled in a school in the
 United States for that year for the purpose of determining a number
 of years under Subsection (a)(1), (2), or (3).
 SECTION 2.  Section 39.054, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d-2) and (d-3) to read as follows:
 (d-2)  Except as provided by Subsection (d-3), in evaluating
 performance under Subsection (c), the commissioner may not lower a
 performance rating for purposes of this chapter based on
 unsatisfactory performance on an assessment instrument
 administered under Section 39.023(a), (b), (c), (l), or (n) to a
 student for a period of two years after the student's initial
 enrollment in a school in the United States if the student is a
 student of limited English proficiency, as defined by Section
 29.052.  Unless a student is enrolled in a school in the United
 States for a period of at least 60 consecutive days during a year,
 the student may not be considered to be enrolled in a school in the
 United States for that year for purposes of this subsection.  This
 subsection does not apply to a performance rating for purposes of:
 (1)  compliance monitoring under Section 7.028; or
 (2)  public school accountability under federal law.
 (d-3)  Subsection (d-2) does not apply if the assessment
 instrument administered to a student of limited English proficiency
 is in the student's native language.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (a-2), Section 39.027, and Subsection
 (d-2), Section 39.054, Education Code, as added by this Act, apply
 to a student regardless of the date on which the student initially
 enrolled in a school in the United States.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *