House | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2273 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2273 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2158 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 90 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 90 | |
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |