E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5384
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3512
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3523
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4901
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3062
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3057
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4499
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4499
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2701
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2701
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2701
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2701
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2700
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#835
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Menndez
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3227
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3226
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 1420
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1420
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 561
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 205
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 205
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|