House | 05/06/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 749 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 519 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 324 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 206 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 206 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |