Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB397 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan S.B. No. 397
 (In the Senate - Filed February 5, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 February 27, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; February 27, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the statute of limitations for an action on a credit
 card account.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (c), Section 16.004, Civil Practice
 and Remedies Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  A person must bring suit against his partner for a
 settlement of partnership accounts, and must bring an action on an
 open, [or] stated, or credit card account, or on a mutual and
 current account concerning the trade of merchandise between
 merchants or their agents or factors, not later than four years
 after the day that the cause of action accrues. For purposes of
 this subsection, the cause of action accrues on the day that the
 dealings in which the parties were interested together cease or, in
 the case of a credit card account, the date the account was charged
 off.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to the limitations period for an action on a credit card account on
 which a payment or charge is made on or after the effective date of
 this Act. The limitations period for an action on a credit card
 account on which a payment or charge is not made on or after the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *