E
|
05/18/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
E
|
05/08/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2720
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#437
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Lewis
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 934
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1981
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 1420
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1420
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 750
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 469
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 294
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 207
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 207
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|