E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/16/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1908 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3519 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1896 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1858 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Record vote | RV#838 | Journal Page: 3298 |
House | 05/15/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3298 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3298 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3227 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3227 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 208 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 208 | |
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |