E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2086
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#912
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amended
|
1-N. Gonzalez
|
Journal Page: 3425
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3425
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2722
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1496
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 799
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 762
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 761
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 310
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 208
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 208
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|