Senate | 04/29/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 209 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 209 | |
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |