E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5434
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3852
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3446
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3446
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3446
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3442
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1057
|
Journal Page: 4164
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4164
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4164
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4095
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4095
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2198
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1171
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 91
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 91
|
Senate
|
11/12/2012
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/12/2012
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|