E | 06/10/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/10/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/16/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1908 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3519 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1896 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1858 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Record vote | RV#836 | Journal Page: 3297 |
House | 05/15/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3297 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3297 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3227 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3227 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1698 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 1201 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1201 | |
House | 03/26/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1103 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 210 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 210 | |
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |