House | 04/17/2013 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 1626 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1626 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1627 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 976 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 620 | |
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 210 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 210 | |
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |