House | 05/17/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3674 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1677 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1677 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 762 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 211 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 211 | |
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |