House | 05/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3909 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1580 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 908 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 908 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 908 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 908 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 908 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 908 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 907 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 798 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 753 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 752 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 607 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 395 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 212 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 212 | |
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |