E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3808
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5022
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1315
|
Journal Page: 5022
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5022
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5387
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3758
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3598
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4882
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4882
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4554
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4554
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4554
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3030
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3030
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3030
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3029
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3028
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1090
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
3-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
5-Zedler
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
3-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4209
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Zedler
|
Journal Page: 4209
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4208
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4054
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4054
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4054
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3228
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2198
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1115
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 497
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 497
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 212
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 212
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|