Senate | 05/17/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1427 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 212 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 212 | |
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |