E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2069
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3395
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#853
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2722
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1189
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 644
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 644
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 644
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 644
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 644
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 644
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 644
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 212
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 212
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|