Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 243 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 212 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 212 | |
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |