Senate | 03/13/2013 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 324 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 213 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 213 | |
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |