E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3834
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4206
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1086
|
Journal Page: 4206
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4206
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4052
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4052
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3674
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1580
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 907
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 907
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 907
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 906
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 906
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 906
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 906
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 620
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 214
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 214
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|