E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3834
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4293
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2794
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2794
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2794
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2794
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#924
|
Journal Page: 3598
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3598
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3598
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3574
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Lucio
|
Journal Page: 3574
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3574
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2722
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 1420
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1420
|
House
|
03/14/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 750
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 519
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 470
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 470
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 470
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 470
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 470
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 470
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 470
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 338
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 322
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 215
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 215
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|